MD HB1120 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain retirees who participate in a certain prescription drug benefit plan with a spouse or dependent child to elect to have the spouse or dependent child covered under a certain State prescription drug benefit plan; authorizing certain surviving spouses and surviving dependent children to elect to enroll in a certain State prescription drug benefit plan; requiring the Department of Budget and Management, on or before January 1, 2020, to establish the Maryland State Retiree Prescription Drug Coverage Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments {824568/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-22HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments {824568/1
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback