MD HB112 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB4
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an Executive Branch agency from banning or regulating the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in any public high school in Baltimore County, if the activity is directed at or organized by students with individualized education programs; and repealing a certain exception that prohibited banning or regulating the sale of coffee in a Baltimore County public high school that sold coffee on or before June 30, 2018, in conjunction with certain activities; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Coffee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {605168/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB112 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore County
Continuing Education
Education
Education - Local Bills
Food
Job Training
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Baltimore County
Continuing Education
Education
Education - Local Bills
Food
Job Training
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations