MD HB1118 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow under a permit for roadside tree care the maintenance or removal of a tree to eliminate a hazard, to enable necessary roadway improvements, and for locally zoned development and land use requirements; prohibiting the Department from authorizing under a permit the maintenance or removal of a roadside tree for specified purposes; requiring an applicant for a permit to remove a roadside tree to demonstrate that a reasonable effort has been made to protect and to preserve the tree; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-39) (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-39) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {370610/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Highways
Licenses
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Trees
Licenses
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Trees