MD HB1113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the Joint Audit Committee to be the Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee and altering its powers and duties; establishing the Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability in the Department of Legislative Services; requiring the Office to conduct certain performance evaluations of certain units of State government; requiring the Office to conduct certain investigations under certain circumstances; altering the manner in which certain governmental units are evaluated under the Maryland Program Evaluation Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510
2019-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Senate Rules
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {934869/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
2019-03-01HouseHearing canceled (Appropriations)
2019-02-15HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects

Accountants
Acupuncturists
Administrative Agencies
Aircraft
Amusement Parks and Carnivals
Appraisals
Apprentices
Appropriations
Architects
Associations
Attorney General
Attorneys
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Auditors and Audits
Cemeteries
Child Care
Chiropractors
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Corporations
Cosmetologists
Counselors
Counties
Court of Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Debt Collection
Dentists
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Disclosure
Discrimination
Drugs
Education, Boards of
Electricians
Elevators
Engineers
Environmental Health
Ethics
Examinations
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Foresters
Fraud
Funerals
Governor
Grand Juries
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Heating and Cooling
Home Improvement
Horse Industry Board
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Judges
Labor and Industry, Division of
Landscape Architects
Law Enforcement
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Massage
Mental and Behavioral Health
Morticians
Nurses
Nursing Homes
Occupational Safety
Occupational Therapists
Open Government
Optometrists
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physical Therapists
Physicians
Plumbing
Podiatrists
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Information
Public Officials
Racing
Real Estate
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Security Alarms
Sewage
Sheriffs
Social Workers
Sports and Recreation
State Employees
State Government - General Assembly
State's Attorneys
Surveyors
Tax Preparers
Veterinarians
Water
Wells
Work, Labor and Employment

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback