MD HB1112 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding to residential property specified authority of the governing body of Carroll County to grant, by law, a green building tax credit against the county property tax imposed on specified properties on which a person installs specified environmentally friendly technologies; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2010; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Green Building Tax Credit
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-28 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Conservation
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Housing
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Conservation
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Housing
Property Tax
Tax Credits