MD HB1105 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting acquisition of substantial influence over an investor-owned electric company if a person would become an affiliate of each investor-owned electric company in the State as a result of the acquisition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investor-Owned Electric Companies - Acquisition of Substantial Influence - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback