MD HB1101 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/16 at 6:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/16 at 6:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Maternity Care Access Program in the Maryland Department of Health to develop and sustain pregnancy support centers in the State; establishing the Maryland Maternity Care Access Program Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring that the interest earnings of the Fund be credited to the Fund; and establishing an income tax checkoff system for voluntary contributions to the Fund.
Title
Maryland Maternity Care Access Program, Fund, and Income Tax Checkoff - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 6:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 5:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2023-02-22 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB901 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-15 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Comptroller
Gifts
Governor
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Income Tax
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Pregnancy
Privacy
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Income
Treasurers
Budgets
Comptroller
Gifts
Governor
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Income Tax
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Pregnancy
Privacy
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Income
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 4801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 2 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1101?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb1101f.pdf |