MD HB1101 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person or an agent, a representative, or a designee of the State or a local government from requiring, coercing, or compelling an individual to undergo a certain implanting of a certain identification device; authorizing an individual who is implanted with a subcutaneous identification device in violation of a certain provision of the Act to file a civil action in a certain court within 3 years after the date on which the identification device was implanted; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Subcutaneous Implanting of Identification Device - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (137-2)
2018-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {126585/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback