MD HB1101 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which an unfair claim settlement practice is considered to have been committed to include failure to act in good faith, as defined under specified provisions of law, in settling any claim, including a third-party claim, under a policy of property and casualty insurance; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Unfair Claim Settlement Practices - Third-Party Claims

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-23 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2010-02-24 Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-24 Hearing cancelled
2010-02-18 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-17 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback