MD HB1100 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 425
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 425
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to meet four times per year instead of every 6 weeks; repealing the requirement that the Board hire general counsel; providing that the Attorney General is the legal advisor for the Board; requiring the Attorney General to designate an assistant attorney general as counsel to the Board; authorizing the Attorney General to assign certain attorneys to the Board under certain circumstances; establishing certain duties for the counsel to the Board; etc.
Title
Prescription Drug Affordability Board – Meetings, Legal Advisor, Reports, and Technical Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 425 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {376982/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Attorney General
Attorneys
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Drugs
Insurance - Health
Public Health
Sunset
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Drugs
Insurance - Health
Public Health
Sunset
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Health - General | 21 | 2C-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 2C-07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 2C-08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 2C-13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21-2C | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21-2C | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21-2C | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |