MD HB110 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-17)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: Mar 20 @ 1:00 pm Senate Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring physical education to be provided in each public school in a planned and sequential manner to all students, prekindergarten through grade 12, for the purpose of developing the students' good health and physical fitness and to improve motor coordination and physical skills; providing as a goal of the State that each student receive a program totaling 150 minutes each week of developmentally appropriate, moderate-to-vigorous activity, including 90 minutes of physical education and recess; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Students – Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)

Sponsors

Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Carl Anderton [R]
Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Sandy Bartlett [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]
Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Jon Cardin [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]
Del. Nick Charles [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Mark Fisher [R]Del. Wanika Fisher [D]
Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. Jeff Ghrist [R]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]
Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]
Del. Julian Ivey [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jacobs [R]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]
Del. Mary Lehman [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Bob Long [R]
Del. Mike Mckay [R]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. David Moon [D]Del. Matt Morgan [R]
Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Charles Otto [R]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]
Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]
Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]Del. Jen Terrasa [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]
Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Joseph Boteler [R]Del. Jason Buckel [R]
Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]Del. Michele Guyton [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Teresa Reilly [R]
Del. April Rose [R]Del. Haven Shoemaker [R]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {975264/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-18HouseHearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback