MD HB1098 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Community Development Administration, after an application for low-income housing tax credits for a property that is owned by a public housing authority and that is to be transferred to a receiving entity, to include in a covenant specified language regarding the duty of the owner of the property; requiring the Administration to include in a specified additional covenant regarding specified properties in Baltimore City specified language regarding the duties of the owner of the property; etc.
Title
Public Housing Authorities - Property Transfers - Rights and Benefits of Tenants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Community Development
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Tax Credits
Baltimore City
Community Development
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Tax Credits