MD HB109 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from selling in the State a certain expanded polystyrene food service product on or after January 1, 2020; prohibiting certain food service businesses and certain schools from selling or providing food in certain expanded polystyrene food service products on or after January 1, 2020; requiring a county health department to impose penalties of up to $250 for certain violations; requiring a county health department to notify the Department of the Environment of certain violations; providing a certain waiver; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-01-31HouseHearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback