MD HB1087 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study a Promise Scholarship Program in Prince George's County; providing that the purpose of the Task Force is to study the feasibility of providing scholarships to pay for tuition and fees not covered by federal or State financial aid for Prince George's County public high school graduates; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations regarding specified matters and to report its findings to the Prince George's County Executive and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study a Promise Scholarship Program in Prince George's County PG 438-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {665369/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Fees
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Tuition
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Fees
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Tuition