MD HB1087 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified distributors, on or before January 1, 2015, to establish or participate in a program, approved by the Department of the Environment, for the collection and recycling of specified beverage containers; requiring specified owners and managers of bars and restaurants, beginning January 1, 2015, to separate, store, and arrange for the collection and recycling of specified beverage containers; etc.
Title
Recycling - Bars and Restaurants - Beverage Containers
Sponsors
Del. Doyle Niemann [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Stephen Lafferty [D] |
Del. Maggie McIntosh [D] | Del. Shane Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters) |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of
Recycling
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of
Recycling
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations