MD HB1085 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "on duty" in the workers' compensation law to include the performance of specified duties assigned to deputy sheriffs or members of a specified fire police unit; altering the definition of "volunteer company" to include a volunteer fire police unit; specifying that a covered member of a volunteer company may not be considered a paid covered employee of the company for receiving as a membership benefit a yearly stipend of $5,200 or less to help offset out-of-pocket expenses; etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Emergency Responders - Revisions
Sponsors
Del. Galen Clagett [D] | Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Glen Glass [R] | Del. Patrick Hogan [R] |
Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Kelly Schulz [R] | Del. John Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 997578/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-20 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-04-01 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments 163295/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-14 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Ambulances
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Salaries
Sheriffs
Volunteers
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Salaries
Sheriffs
Volunteers
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation