MD HB1082 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a landlord to withhold all or part of a security deposit under a residential lease for unpaid water and sewer bills if water and sewer bills are required to be paid by the tenant under the lease; making conforming changes to provisions relating to purchasing a surety bond instead of paying all or part of a security deposit; altering the definition of "security deposit"; etc.
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer Bills
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McKay [R] | Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Sid Saab [R] | Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] |
Del. Brett Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2015-03-09 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |