MD HB108 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the annual compensation of certain nonstudent members of the Baltimore County Board of Education from $7,500 to $16,500; providing that the chair of the county board is entitled to receive $17,500 annually as compensation; and increasing the amount that a student member of the board is granted for a certain scholarship from $7,500 to $10,000.
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarships - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357 |
2024-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-7) |
2024-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {193921/1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2023-10-26 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB451 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Subjects
Baltimore County
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Public Officials
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Public Officials
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 3 | 2B-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 2B-06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |