MD HB108 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to require that proposals requesting Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program funding contain certain response standards that minimize law enforcement interaction for individuals in crisis; altering the proposals the Department is required to prioritize in awarding grants under the Program; requiring a local behavioral health authority, for each service or program that receives funding under the Program, to make certain information available to the public; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22HouseHearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseHearing canceled
2020-12-23HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-10-30HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB286 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-15 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General101401(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General101402(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General101403(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General5208(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback