MD HB1078 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County or the governing body of a municipal corporation in Prince George's County to grant a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on a dwelling that is owned by a homeowner who has an annual gross income of $70,000 or less; and requiring the property tax credit to be of a sufficient amount to ensure that the total amount of real property taxes on the dwelling does not annually increase.
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Offset of Annual Tax Increases PG 412-23
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Laws and Ordinances
Low-Income
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Real Property
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Low-Income
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Real Property
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |