MD HB1078 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "dealer's facility" and "dealership facility" to include any Internet location where a dealer conducts the business authorized by its license, for purposes of specified prohibitions on the coercion of motor vehicle dealers by motor vehicle manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches.
Title
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Electronic Commerce
Harassment
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Violence
Harassment
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Violence