MD HB1073 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to coordinate the accessibility of electronic advance care planning documents in the State; requiring certain health care facilities, managed care organizations, and carriers to take certain actions relating to electronic advance care planning documents; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to submit a report regarding the implementation of certain provisions of law relating to advance directives; etc.
Title
Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311 |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {753824/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {323121/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB824 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Subjects
Advance Medical Directives
Assisted Living
Cybersecurity
Data
Disabilities
Elderly
Electronic Government
Forms
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
internet
Managed Care Organizations
Motor Vehicle Administration
Nonprofit Organizations
Nursing Homes
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Assisted Living
Cybersecurity
Data
Disabilities
Elderly
Electronic Government
Forms
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
internet
Managed Care Organizations
Motor Vehicle Administration
Nonprofit Organizations
Nursing Homes
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 144 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 615 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 622 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 122.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |