MD HB1066 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Human Services to allow an applicant for or recipient of assistance under the Family Investment Program to meet a work activity requirement by participating in vocational education for a minimum of 20 hours per week that leads to an associate degree, a diploma, or a certificate, or 20 hours per week of education directly related to employment; requiring the Department to report certain information to the General Assembly by October 1 of each year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {347375/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {464564/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-14HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1066&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1066f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1066t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1066e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1066_46456401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1066_34737501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb1066.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1066_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0582.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1066_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1026.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1207.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback