MD HB105 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Central Collection Unit from collecting certain unpaid video tolls and associated civil penalties incurred by a person residing outside the State, except under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transportation Authority Facilities - Video Tolls - Collection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-5) (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (129-6)
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-06HouseFloor Amendment {893724/2 (Delegate Carr) Rejected
2019-03-01HouseSpecial Order until 03/06 (Delegate Carr) Adopted
2019-03-01HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-28HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback