MD HB1049 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a provision of law requiring that a trustee seeking a release of the trustee from liability for administration of a trust send a certain interested party from whom the trustee is seeking the release a certain report; providing for the submission of a statement by an interested party to a trust under the Maryland Trust Act that the interested party does not object to the release from liability of a trustee for administration of the trust under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Trustee Liability - Release by Interested Parties
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB878 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 633
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 5 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |