MD HB1047 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow specified individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; expanding eligibility of the credit to allow specified individuals without qualifying children to claim the credit; allowing specified individuals 21 years of age and older to claim the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-8) (Y: 130 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-8) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {295364/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |