MD HB1039 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual to itemize deductions to compute Maryland taxable income whether or not the individual itemizes deductions on the individual's federal income tax return; providing that, for an individual who does not itemize deductions on the individual's federal income tax return, Maryland itemized deductions shall be determined as if an individual itemized deductions on the federal income tax return; applying the Act to tax years after 2018; etc.
Title
Income Tax – Itemized Deductions on State Income Tax Return
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |