MD HB1035 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 413
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the authorized uses of the Bay Restoration Fund to include certain costs associated with the connection of a property using an on-site sewage disposal system to an existing municipal wastewater facility that has signed a funding agreement with the Department of the Environment and is under construction to achieve enhanced nutrient removal or biological nutrient removal level treatment; specifying that these costs may be provided only if certain conditions are met; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bay Restoration Fund – Use of Funds – Municipal Wastewater Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 413
2020-03-16HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {240116/1 Adopted
2020-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB495 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Referred Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment91605.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback