MD HB1033 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a tobacco product manufacturer and a certain electronic smoking devices manufacturer to pay a certain certification fee; authorizing the Executive Director of the Alcohol, Tobacco, and Cannabis Commission and the Attorney General to take certain action relating to the licensure of certain electronic smoking devices manufacturers, wholesalers, importers, and retailers and vape shop vendors in certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB987 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-09 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Attorney General
Business Regulation
Certifications
Cigarettes
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Copyright
Courts
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Federal Government
Fees
Fines
Foreign Trade
Forfeiture
Forms
Health
Industry and Technology
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Public Information
Records
Registration
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Smoking and Vaping
Standards and Best Practices
Time
Tobacco and Nicotine
Agents and Brokers
Attorney General
Business Regulation
Certifications
Cigarettes
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Copyright
Courts
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Federal Government
Fees
Fines
Foreign Trade
Forfeiture
Forms
Health
Industry and Technology
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Public Information
Records
Registration
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Smoking and Vaping
Standards and Best Practices
Time
Tobacco and Nicotine