MD HB103 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1258
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1175
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1175
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the governing body of a county or of a municipal corporation to grant a tax credit against the property tax imposed on the dwelling house of certain disabled veterans; establishing a tax credit against the State property tax on the dwelling house of certain disabled veterans; providing for the calculation of the credit; requiring certain disabled veterans to provide certain documents when applying for the credits under the Act; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2021-09-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB103 (Carry Over) 2022-01-04 - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1175 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
SB85 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-24 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1175 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
SB85 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-24 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Counties
Disabilities
Disabled
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Records
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Disabilities
Disabled
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Records
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0103?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0103f.pdf |