MD HB1027 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain members of the State Retirement and Pension System to receive credit for certain military service even if the member receives military service credit in another retirement system.
Title
Military Service Credit - Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB487 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/05 at 3:30 p.m.
Subjects
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Law Enforcement
Retirement
State Pensions and Retirement
Time
Veterans
Work, Labor and Employment
Correctional Officers
Law Enforcement
Retirement
State Pensions and Retirement
Time
Veterans
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 38 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1027?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1027f.pdf |