MD HB1017 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring individual, group, or blanket health insurance policies and nonprofit health service plans to cover, in the minimum package of child wellness services required to be provided under their family member coverage, visits for obesity evaluation and management and visits for and costs of developmental screening; expanding the list of visits at which examinations, assessments, and guidance services must be covered; expanding the list of services that may result in coverage for laboratory tests; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Child Wellness Benefits
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. William Bronrott [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. James Hubbard [D] |
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Del. Kirill Reznik [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-15 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |