MD HB1010 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board; requiring the Administration to prepare a specified comprehensive multimodal transit development plan; requiring the Administration to establish the Citizens Advisory Council for the Maryland Transit Administration, the MARC Riders Advisory Council for the Maryland Transit Administration, and the Accessible Transportation Advisory Council for the Maryland Transit Administration; requiring the Administration to submit a report to the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-51) (Y: 87 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (26-19) (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Young) {483521/1 Rejected (17-29) (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion limit debate (Pugh) Adopted (30-15) (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (Jennings) Rejected (15-29) (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-51) (Y: 84 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (26-19) (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Young) {483521/1 Rejected (17-29) (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion limit debate (Pugh) Adopted (30-15) (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (Jennings) Rejected (15-29) (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-51) (Y: 84 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-51) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (26-19) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {483521/1 Rejected (17-29) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-29) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {487376/1 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {487376/1 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {487376/1 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (84-51) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {460910/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-15 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Commuters
Electronic Government
Legislative Services, Department of
Mass Transit
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Records
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Transportation - Generally
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Commuters
Electronic Government
Legislative Services, Department of
Mass Transit
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Records
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Transportation - Generally