MD HB1008 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of early voting centers that counties with more than 200,000 registered voters are required to establish; providing that counties with fewer than 200,000 registered voters may establish one additional early voting center under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-49) (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-45) (Y: 95 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-45) (Y: 95 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288 |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-49) |
2016-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {874937/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-26 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-45) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {435967/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |