MD HB1007 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years to require a certain percentage of energy from Tier 1 renewable sources each year to be derived from certain geothermal heating and cooling systems; requiring a certain percentage of energy required to be derived from certain geothermal heating and cooling systems to be from systems installed on certain property; altering the methods for calculating certain energy savings; providing for the regulation and enforcement of certain requirements by the Department of Labor; etc.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-30) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {507770/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-21) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {543391/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB810 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Apprentices
Collective Bargaining
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Construction
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Federal Aid
Fees
Food
Heating and Cooling
Housing
Insurance
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Leave
Medical Assistance
Minorities
Poverty
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Retirement
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
State Aid
Students
Time
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Water
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Collective Bargaining
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Construction
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Federal Aid
Fees
Food
Heating and Cooling
Housing
Insurance
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Leave
Medical Assistance
Minorities
Poverty
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Retirement
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
State Aid
Students
Time
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Water
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |