MD HB1006 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "public school employee" as it relates to collective bargaining units of employees in Baltimore County; altering the composition of a unit of employees in Baltimore County; and including a unit of supervisory employees among specified units authorized in Baltimore County.
Title
Baltimore County - Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (95-42) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 505267/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Collective Bargaining
Public Employees
Public Schools
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Public Employees
Public Schools
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment