MD HB1003 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified provision of law concerning equal pay for equal work to prohibit discrimination on the basis of gender identity; prohibiting an employer from discriminating between employees in any occupation by providing less favorable employment opportunities based on sex or gender identity; prohibiting an employer from forbidding an employee from inquiring about, discussing, or disclosing the wages of specified employees or requesting that the employer provide a reason why the employee's wages are a condition of employment; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-33) (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-47) (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Malone) {203322/1 Rejected (48-88) (Y: 48 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel) {973922/1 Rejected (48-87) (Y: 48 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel) {873621/1 Rejected (45-89) (Y: 45 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {313024/1 Rejected (47-89) (Y: 47 N: 89 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {833628/1 Rejected (53-86) (Y: 53 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) {373324/1 Rejected (47-90) (Y: 47 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McComas) {303528/1 Rejected (50-87) (Y: 50 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Grammer) {583528/1 Rejected (49-87) (Y: 49 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-47) (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Malone) {203322/1 Rejected (48-88) (Y: 48 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel) {973922/1 Rejected (48-87) (Y: 48 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Buckel) {873621/1 Rejected (45-89) (Y: 45 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {313024/1 Rejected (47-89) (Y: 47 N: 89 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {833628/1 Rejected (53-86) (Y: 53 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) {373324/1 Rejected (47-90) (Y: 47 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McComas) {303528/1 Rejected (50-87) (Y: 50 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Grammer) {583528/1 Rejected (49-87) (Y: 49 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557 |
2016-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-33) |
2016-04-09 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {407776/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {407776/1 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-47) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Malone) {203322/1 Rejected (48-88) |
2016-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {973922/1 Rejected (48-87) |
2016-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {873621/1 Rejected (45-89) |
2016-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {313024/1 Rejected (47-89) |
2016-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {833628/1 Rejected (53-86) |
2016-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {373324/1 Rejected (47-90) |
2016-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) {303528/1 Rejected (50-87) |
2016-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Grammer) {583528/1 Rejected (49-87) |
2016-03-17 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {453897/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Discipline
Discrimination
Education
Industry and Technology
Interest
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Salaries and Compensation
Sexual Orientation
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Discipline
Discrimination
Education
Industry and Technology
Interest
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Salaries and Compensation
Sexual Orientation
Women
Work, Labor and Employment