MA S99 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow for additional liquor licenses in cities and towns. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To allow for additional liquor licenses in cities and towns
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Flanagan [D] | Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. Dennis Rosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4042 |
2013-11-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4042 (Replaced by) 2014-06-16 - Reported, in part, by H3636
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S99 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S99.pdf |