MA S98 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update reciprocity for licensing optometrists. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to updating reciprocity for licensing optometrists.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Flanagan [D] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-03-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2014 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-1 |
2014-01-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2014-01-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S98 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S98.pdf |