MA S971 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to assist the investigation of serious crimes. The Judiciary.
Title
To assist the investigation of serious crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2597 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1883 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H2965 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H775 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2597 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1883 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H2965 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H775 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S971 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S971.pdf |