MA S97 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2009
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand the sale of products by farmer breweries. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To expand the sale of products by farmer breweries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2009 |
2013-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2009 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S97 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S97.pdf |