MA S952 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize time-share extension and termination procedures. The Judiciary.
Title
Modernizing time-share extension and termination procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-05-21 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3421 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Senate concurred
H1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3434 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1117 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S174 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H1508 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3434 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1117 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S174 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H1508 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S952 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S952.pdf |