MA S951 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3232
Note: Legislation replaced by H3411
Note: Legislation replaced by H3411
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Hingham to change the use of certain parcels of land. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing the town of Hingham to change the use of certain parcels of land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3411 |
2013-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3232 (Replaced by) 2013-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3411
H3411 (Replaced by) 2013-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2013
H3411 (Replaced by) 2013-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2013
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S951 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S951.pdf |