MA S943 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2313

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-6)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to update privacy protections for personal electronic information. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect electronic privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2313
2017-06-05JointHearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback