MA S942 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote public safety and better outcomes for young adults. The Judiciary.
Title
To promote public safety and better outcomes for young adults
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1710 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S942 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S942.pdf |