MA S934 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2100
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent discrimination based on veteran's status
Title
Preventing discrimination based on veteran's status.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2100 |
2011-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2011 from 10:30 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2100 (Replaced by) 2012-01-05 - Discharged to the Senate committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S934 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10109&generalCourtId=1 |