MA S93 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4486
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide municipal control of liquor licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Providing municipal control of liquor licenses
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4486 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday July 08, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 03, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-11-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4486 (Replaced by) 2014-09-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S93 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S93.pdf |