MA S926 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2458

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2458
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to fentanyl test strips. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to fentanyl test strips

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-10SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2458
2023-06-06JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2009 (Similar To) 2023-10-12 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1822 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1736 (Similar To) 2023-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2458
S2458 (Replaced by) 2024-01-04 - New draft substituted, see S2543
S2543 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback