MA S919 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to deny paternity rights to rapists. The Judiciary.
Title
Denying paternity rights to perpetrators of rape
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen O'Connor Ives [D] | Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Linda Campbell [D] |
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S951 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S954 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S854 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S780 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S832 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H773 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H991 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H992 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S954 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S854 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S780 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S832 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H773 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H991 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H992 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S919 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S919.pdf |