MA S919 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2236
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require recordkeeping at public construction worksites in order to protect first responders. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Requiring recordkeeping at public construction worksites in order to protect first responders
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Sen. Richard Moore [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] |
Rep. George Ross [R] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2236 |
2011-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
S2236 (Replaced by) 2012-04-30 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S919 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10763&generalCourtId=1 |